Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cándido Rada Senosiáin, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guaranda, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1905Born
1923²17.6EnteredMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
5 Jul 193126.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
9 Jun 194540.0AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
12 Aug 194540.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
13 Dec 194742.5AppointedBishop of Punta Arenas, Chile
22 Dec 194944.5ResignedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
22 Dec 194944.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pinara
31 Mar 196054.8AppointedBishop of Guaranda, Ecuador
24 May 198075.0RetiredBishop of Guaranda, Ecuador
7 Aug 199590.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Guaranda, Ecuador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Cándido Rada Senosiáin
Bishop Cándido Rada Senosiáin S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guaranda

EventPlace
Birth PlacePunta Arenas, Diocese of Punta Arenas, Chile
Ordained PriestTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 49.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 42
  • c1/puna: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast