Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Bernardino Berríos Gaínza, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Felipe, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1885Born
1898²12.9EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
4 Sep 190217.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
10 Jun 191126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
19 Mar 193853.1AppointedBishop of San Felipe, Chile
17 Jul 193853.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Felipe, Chile
24 Jul 193853.5InstalledBishop of San Felipe, Chile
23 Nov 195772.8ResignedBishop of San Felipe, Chile
23 Nov 195772.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
20 Dec 197085.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
22 Jul 197590.5DiedBishop Emeritus of San Felipe, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roberto Bernardino Berríos Gaínza
Bishop Roberto Bernardino Berríos Gaínza O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Felipe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNavidad

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 53
  • prof: CB, 9 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017