Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Yáñez Ruiz Tagle, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Los Angeles, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1908Born
21 May 193223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Mar 196455.7AppointedBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
21 Jun 196456.0Ordained BishopBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
27 Jun 196456.0InstalledBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
21 Nov 196557.4DiedBishop of Los Angeles, Chile

MicroData Summary for Luis Yáñez Ruiz Tagle
Bishop Luis Yáñez Ruiz Tagle O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Los Angeles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoigue

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • opd: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017