Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Maximiano Valdés Subercaseaux, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Osorno, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1908Born
26 Jan 193021.3EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Mar 193425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 Jun 195647.7AppointedBishop of Osorno, Chile
16 Sep 195647.9Ordained BishopBishop of Osorno, Chile
18 Oct 195648.0InstalledBishop of Osorno, Chile
4 Jan 198273.2DiedBishop of Osorno, Chile

MicroData Summary for Francisco Maximiano Valdés Subercaseaux (VIAF: 3906849)
Bishop Francisco Maximiano Valdés Subercaseaux O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Osorno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained PriestVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 82
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017