Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Guillermo Hartl de Laufen, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Araucanía, Chile

Titular Bishop of Stratonicea in Caria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1904Born
27 Mar 192318.8EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Apr 192419.8Simple VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Jul 192824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Nov 195652.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Araucanía, Chile
9 Nov 195652.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Stratonicea in Caria
17 Mar 195752.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Stratonicea in Caria
5 Mar 195853.8SucceededVicar Apostolic of Araucanía, Chile
6 Feb 197772.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Araucanía, Chile

MicroData Summary for Carlos Guillermo Hartl de Laufen
Bishop Carlos Guillermo Hartl de Laufen O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Araucanía

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLaufen, Germany
Ordained PriestAugsburg, Diocese of Augsburg, Germany

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • prof/c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017