Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Villarrica

Dioecesis Villaricensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Araucanía
16 July 1901ErectedDiocese of Concepción Prefecture Apostolic of Araucanía (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Araucanía
28 March 1928ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Araucanía Vicariate Apostolic of Araucanía
Diocese of Villarrica
19 November 2001ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Araucanía Diocese of Villarrica

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Araucanía
1950131,399347,88937.8%2440642,0536013525ap1951
1966383,949408,76693.9%3840784,9227333828ap1967
1970330,5243037674,9335630528ap1971
1976356,152383,77192.8%3334675,3155929729ap1977
1980385,252422,95791.1%3030606,4205919230ap1981
1990357,000402,30088.7%3721586,1553726629ap1991
1999360,000410,00087.8%4320635,71462817731ap2000
2000345,000390,00088.5%4620665,22762817330ap2001
Diocese of Villarrica
2001345,000395,00087.3%4521665,22762817830ap2002
2002345,000397,00086.9%4621675,14962717430ap2003
2003345,000395,00087.3%4218605,75062417030ap2004
2004270,000385,00070.1%4218604,50062416630ap2005
2010281,000401,00070.1%3617535,301132420730ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 14 Dec 2013