Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sixto José Parzinger Foidl, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Villarrica, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1931 Born
21 Aug 195422.6EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Aug 195523.6Simple VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Aug 195826.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Jun 196028.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Dec 197745.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Araucanía, Chile
17 Dec 197745.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaguari
5 Feb 197846.1InstalledVicar Apostolic of Araucanía, Chile
5 Mar 197846.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaguari
19 Nov 200169.9AppointedBishop of Villarrica, Chile
7 Feb 200977.1RetiredBishop of Villarrica, Chile

MicroData Summary for Sixto José Parzinger Foidl
Bishop Sixto José Parzinger Foidl O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Villarrica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Johan in Tirol, Austria
Ordained PriestFreising, Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Villarrica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • vows/c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017