Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sergio Otoniel Contreras Navia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Temuco, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1926Born
21 Sep 195731.4Ordained PriestPriest of Valparaíso, Chile
21 Nov 196640.5AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
27 Dec 196640.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
14 Jan 196740.7InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
25 Jan 197447.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
25 Jan 197447.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Semta
23 Dec 197751.6AppointedBishop of Temuco, Chile
15 Jan 197851.7InstalledBishop of Temuco, Chile
29 Apr 199569.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Valdivia, Chile
8 Sep 199670.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Valdivia, Chile
21 Sep 200175.4RetiredBishop of Temuco, Chile
5 Jan 201992.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Temuco, Chile

MicroData Summary for Sergio Otoniel Contreras Navia (VIAF: 102145856972022920878)
Bishop Sergio Otoniel Contreras Navia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Temuco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValparaíso, Diocese of Valparaíso
Death PlaceTemuco, Diocese of Temuco

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 52.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 9 Apr 2017
  • d: CB, 5 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 Mar 2019

Quantcast