Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aldo Maria Lazzarín Stella, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Aysén

Titular Bishop of Tigisi in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1926BornSelva di Volpago del Montello, Italy
10 Oct 194821.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
8 Apr 195023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
15 May 198962.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Aysén, Chile
15 May 198962.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Numidia
13 Aug 198962.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Numidia
19 Jan 199871.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Aysén, Chile
16 Oct 201083.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Aysén, Chile

MicroData Summary for Aldo Maria Lazzarín Stella:
Bishop Aldo Maria Lazzarín Stella O.S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Aysén

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,463
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013