Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Savino Bernardo Maria Cazzaro Bertollo, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Puerto Montt, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1924Born
11 Aug 194116.7EnteredMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
15 Aug 194217.7Simple VowsMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
22 Sep 194621.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
16 Apr 194924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
10 Dec 196339.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Aysén, Chile
10 Dec 196339.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Pyrgos
13 Feb 196439.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pyrgos
12 Apr 196439.3InstalledVicar Apostolic of Aysén, Chile
8 Feb 198863.1AppointedArchbishop of Puerto Montt, Chile
10 Apr 198863.3InstalledArchbishop of Puerto Montt, Chile
27 Feb 200176.2RetiredArchbishop of Puerto Montt, Chile
13 Aug 201792.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Puerto Montt, Chile

MicroData Summary for Savino Bernardo Maria Cazzaro Bertollo
Archbishop Savino Bernardo Maria Cazzaro Bertollo O.S.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Puerto Montt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbbazia Pisani, Italy
Ordained PriestSt. John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 53.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: CB, 13 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Aug 2017