Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Maria Florindo Agurto Muñoz, O.S.M.

Bishop of San Carlos de Ancud


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1959 BornSantiago de Chile
28 Jun 198627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
22 Oct 200142.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
6 Jan 200242.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
15 Sep 200546.6SucceededBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile

MicroData Summary for Juan Maria Florindo Agurto Muñoz:
Bishop Juan Maria Florindo Agurto Muñoz O.S.M. (born ) Bishop of San Carlos de Ancud

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Carlos de Ancud.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,106
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013