Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eladio Vicuña Aránguiz

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Puerto Montt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1911BornSantiago de Chile
22 Sep 193423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
28 Aug 195544.2AppointedBishop of Chillán, Chile
18 Oct 195544.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chillán, Chile
23 Oct 195544.4InstalledBishop of Chillán, Chile
16 Jul 197463.1AppointedArchbishop of Puerto Montt, Chile
18 Aug 197463.2InstalledArchbishop of Puerto Montt, Chile
13 May 198775.9RetiredArchbishop of Puerto Montt, Chile
29 Jun 200897.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Puerto Montt, Chile

MicroData Summary for Eladio Vicuña Aránguiz:
Archbishop Eladio Vicuña Aránguiz (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Puerto Montt

  • a priest for 73.8 years
  • a bishop for 52.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 91
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013