Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Moreno Casamitjana

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1927Born
4 Dec 194922.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
22 Apr 198658.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
22 Apr 198658.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mades
9 Jul 198659.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mades
14 Oct 198962.2AppointedArchbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
12 Nov 198962.3InstalledArchbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
27 Dec 200679.4RetiredArchbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
31 Jul 201386.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile

MicroData Summary for Antonio Moreno Casamitjana (VIAF: 13701224)
Archbishop Antonio Moreno Casamitjana (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 31 Jul 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017