Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Alvear Urrutia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Felipe

Titular Bishop of Sita

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1916BornCauquenes
20 Sep 194125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
4 Mar 196347.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Talca, Chile
4 Mar 196347.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Columnata
21 Apr 196347.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Columnata
7 Jun 196549.4AppointedBishop of San Felipe, Chile
9 Feb 197458.0ResignedBishop of San Felipe, Chile
9 Feb 197458.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
9 Feb 197458.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sita
29 Apr 198266.2DiedBishop Emeritus of San Felipe, Chile

MicroData Summary for Enrique Alvear Urrutia:
Bishop Enrique Alvear Urrutia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Felipe

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013