Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejandro Menchaca Lira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Temuco, Chile

Titular Bishop of Pinara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1903Born
17 Dec 192724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
9 Aug 194137.9AppointedBishop of Temuco, Chile
12 Oct 194138.1Ordained BishopBishop of Temuco, Chile
24 Oct 194138.1InstalledBishop of Temuco, Chile
13 Sep 196057.0ResignedBishop of Temuco, Chile
13 Sep 196057.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Pinara
21 Jul 197470.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Temuco, Chile

MicroData Summary for Alejandro Menchaca Lira
Bishop Alejandro Menchaca Lira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Temuco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConcepción, Diocese of Concepción
Ordained PriestCathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1975, Necrology (back)
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017