Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo Duarte García de Cortázar, SS.CC.

Bishop Emeritus of Valparaíso, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1942 Born
5 Mar 195916.4EnteredMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
17 Apr 196017.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
8 Jul 196825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
31 Jan 199552.3AppointedBishop of Chile, Military
31 Jan 199552.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamiggiga
2 Apr 199552.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamiggiga
7 Mar 199855.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Lamiggiga
4 Dec 199856.1AppointedBishop of Valparaíso, Chile
4 Nov 199957.1ResignedBishop of Chile, Military
11 Jun 201875.7RetiredBishop of Valparaíso, Chile

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Duarte García de Cortázar
Bishop Gonzalo Duarte García de Cortázar SS.CC. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Valparaíso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValparaiso, Diocese of Valparaíso
Ordained PriestSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopTemplo Votivo Nacional, Maipú

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Valparaíso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,505
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast