Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Joaquín Matte Varas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chile, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1923BornSantiago de Chile
20 Sep 194724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
26 Nov 198360.6AppointedBishop of Chile, Military
26 Nov 198360.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Alba
30 Dec 198360.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alba
31 Jan 199571.8ResignedBishop of Chile, Military
7 Mar 199874.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Alba
12 May 201087.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Chile, Military

MicroData Summary for José Joaquín Matte Varas:
Bishop José Joaquín Matte Varas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chile, Military

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 25 Feb 2014