Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pablo Lizama Riquelme

Archbishop Emeritus of Antofagasta, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1941 Born
6 Jul 196726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
19 Dec 198544.5AppointedPrelate of Illapel, Chile
9 Mar 198644.7Ordained BishopPrelate of Illapel, Chile
16 Mar 198644.7InstalledPrelate of Illapel, Chile
24 Feb 198846.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Talca, Chile
4 Apr 199149.8AppointedBishop of Melipilla, Chile
1 May 199149.9InstalledBishop of Melipilla, Chile
4 Jan 199957.5AppointedBishop of Chile, Military
27 Feb 200462.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Antofagasta, Chile
26 Nov 200463.4SucceededArchbishop of Antofagasta, Chile
9 Oct 201271.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Iquique, Chile
29 Mar 201472.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Iquique, Chile
8 Jun 201776.0RetiredArchbishop of Antofagasta, Chile

MicroData Summary for Pablo Lizama Riquelme
Archbishop Pablo Lizama Riquelme (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Antofagasta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Antofagasta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab/iqui: CB, 9 Oct 2012
  • c1/i: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jun 2017