Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Cristián Carlos Roncagliolo Pacheco

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of Hospita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1969 Born
24 Oct 199829.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
3 Jul 199929.8Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
23 Mar 201747.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
23 Mar 201747.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hospita
29 Apr 201747.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hospita

MicroData Summary for Cristián Carlos Roncagliolo Pacheco (VIAF: 283452481)
Father Cristián Carlos Roncagliolo Pacheco (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 24 Mar 2017
  • c2: CB, 16 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017