Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ricardo Cardinal Ezzati Andrello, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Santiago de Chile

Cardinal-Priest of Santissimo Redentore a Valmelaina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1942 BornCampiglia dei Berici
30 Dec 196625.0Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
18 Mar 197028.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
28 Jun 199654.5AppointedBishop of Valdivia, Chile
8 Sep 199654.7Ordained BishopBishop of Valdivia, Chile
10 Jul 200159.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
10 Jul 200159.5AppointedTitular Bishop of La Imperial
27 Dec 200665.0AppointedArchbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
15 Dec 201068.9AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
22 Feb 201472.1Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201472.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Redentore a Valmelaina
11 Oct 201472.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Redentore a Valmelaina

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Ezzati Andrello:
Ricardo Cardinal Ezzati Andrello S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,788
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cp: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 7 Oct 2014