Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Natalio Chomalí Garib

Archbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)

Apostolic Administrator of Osorno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1957 BornSantiago de Chile
6 Apr 199134.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
6 Apr 200649.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
6 Apr 200649.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Noba
3 Jun 200649.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Noba
20 Apr 201154.1AppointedArchbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
28 May 201154.2InstalledArchbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
Apr 2014²57.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Osorno, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Natalio Chomalí Garib:
Archbishop Fernando Natalio Chomalí Garib (born ) Archbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,166
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Apr 2011
  • i: CB, 21 Apr 2011
  • ab: CB, 15 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014