Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristián Contreras Villarroel

Bishop of Melipilla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1959 BornSantiago de Chile
5 Dec 198425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
25 Apr 200344.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
25 Apr 200344.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Illiberi
21 Jun 200344.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Illiberi
7 Mar 201454.9AppointedBishop of Melipilla, Chile

MicroData Summary for Cristián Contreras Villarroel:
Bishop Cristián Contreras Villarroel (born ) Bishop of Melipilla

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Melipilla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,413
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Apr 2014