Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Moisés Carlos Atisha Contreras

Bishop of San Marcos de Arica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1969 BornSantiago de Chile
11 Mar 199425.0ProfessedMember of Order of the Pious Schools
25 Mar 199425.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Pious Schools
14 Dec 199425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
8 Jun 200132.2IncardinatedPriest of Santiago de Chile
21 Nov 201445.7AppointedBishop of San Marcos de Arica, Chile
17 Jan 201545.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Marcos de Arica, Chile

MicroData Summary for Moisés Carlos Atisha Contreras:
Bishop Moisés Carlos Atisha Contreras (born ) Bishop of San Marcos de Arica

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Marcos de Arica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 25 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 16 Jan 2015
  • c2+: CB, 18 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,354

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015