Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Iquique

Dioecesis Iquiquensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 20 December 1929
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Antofagasta
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Chile
  • Square Kilometers: 41,799 (16,144 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.iglesiadeiquique.cl/
  • Mailing Address: Casilla 18D, Bolivar 588, Iquique, Chile
  • Telephone: (057)422.719
  • Fax: 422.230

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Tarapacá
1880ErectedDiocese of Arequipa Vicariate Apostolic of Tarapacá (erected)
Diocese of Iquique
20 December 1929ErectedDiocese of Arequipa
Vicariate Apostolic of Tarapacá (suppressed)
Diocese of Iquique (erected)
17 February 1959Territory LostDiocese of Iquique Territorial Prelature of Arica (erected)
21 July 1965Territory LostDiocese of Antofagasta
Diocese of Iquique
Territorial Prelature of Calama (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Iquique
1949110,000115,00095.7%828363,055334223ap1951
196671,95875,48295.3%621272,665285418ap1967
197092,000.0%922310293516ap1971
197690,000100,00090.0%712194,7361142316ap1977
198088,457107,87582.0%711184,9142122516ap1981
1990126,758158,44880.0%1016264,8753174117ap1991
1999150,760188,45080.0%1417314,8637193518ap2000
2000157,283196,60480.0%1418324,9158203518ap2001
2001160,484200,60580.0%1418325,0158203520ap2002
2002192,000240,00080.0%1321345,6478233519ap2003
2003190,400238,00080.0%1320335,7698233519ap2004
2004124,447238,00052.3%1318314,0148213520ap2005
2006124,447238,00052.3%1118294,29111213420ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 7 Mar 2014