Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Plácido Labarca Olivares

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1838BornSanta Rosa de los Andes
20 Dec 186224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
188748.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile
26 Jun 189051.5AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
8 Sep 189051.7Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
21 Sep 189051.7InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
9 Oct 190566.8DiedBishop of Concepción, Chile

MicroData Summary for Plácido Labarca Olivares:
Bishop Plácido Labarca Olivares (born , died ) Bishop of Concepción

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013