Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José del Carmen Valle Gallardo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Iquique, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1908Born
17 Dec 193224.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Serena, Chile
25 Jul 196354.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Iquique, Chile
25 Jul 196354.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Germania in Numidia
25 Aug 196354.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germania in Numidia
21 Nov 196657.9AppointedBishop of Iquique, Chile
9 Apr 196758.3InstalledBishop of Iquique, Chile
9 Jul 198475.5RetiredBishop of Iquique, Chile
10 Jun 200091.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Iquique, Chile

MicroData Summary for José del Carmen Valle Gallardo
Bishop José del Carmen Valle Gallardo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Iquique

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanela
Ordained PriestBishop's Residence, Chapel, La Serena, Diocese of La Serena

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017