Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Labbé Márquez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Iquique

Titular Bishop of Leuce

Vicar Apostolic of Chile, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1876BornCuricó
23 Dec 189923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
2 Aug 192649.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile
2 Aug 192649.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bida
21 Nov 192650.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bida
29 Dec 192953.1AppointedBishop of Iquique, Chile
5 Jun 193053.5InstalledBishop of Iquique, Chile
30 Jun 194164.6ResignedBishop of Iquique, Chile
30 Jun 194164.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chile, Military
30 Jun 194164.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
17 Oct 194164.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Iquique, Chile

MicroData Summary for Carlos Labbé Márquez:
Bishop Carlos Labbé Márquez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Iquique

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013