Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Daniel Fuenzalida Santelices

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarapacá, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1847Born
21 Dec 187225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
1892²44.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile
1895²47.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile
15 Jun 192880.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarapacá, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniel Fuenzalida Santelices
Father Daniel Fuenzalida Santelices (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarapacá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVichuquén
Death PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 55.4 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Apr 2021

Quantcast