Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Troncoso Troncoso

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Melipilla, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1937Born
23 Dec 196124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
15 Jul 198951.6AppointedBishop of Iquique, Chile
12 Aug 198951.7Ordained BishopBishop of Iquique, Chile
30 Sep 198951.8InstalledBishop of Iquique, Chile
28 May 200062.5AppointedBishop of Melipilla, Chile
7 Mar 201476.3RetiredBishop of Melipilla, Chile
29 Mar 201880.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Melipilla, Chile

MicroData Summary for Enrique Troncoso Troncoso
Bishop Enrique Troncoso Troncoso (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Melipilla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlhué
Ordained PriestSan Ignacio, Church, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopMaipu
Death PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,462
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2014
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • d: CB, 30 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast