Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Juan Carter Gallo

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile

Titular Bishop of Anthedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1842Born
23 Dec 186523.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Serena, Chile
15 Jun 189350.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Serena, Chile
15 Jun 189350.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Anthedon
15 Apr 189451.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anthedon
12 Jun 189552.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile
30 Aug 190664.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Juan Carter Gallo
Bishop Guillermo Juan Carter Gallo (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tarapacá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Serena
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,224
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 106
  • c1: CB, 9 Apr 2017
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017