Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hernán Frías Hurtado

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Antofagasta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1904BornSantiago de Chile
17 Dec 192722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
28 Mar 194035.2AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
2 Jun 194035.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
22 Jun 194035.4InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
13 Jan 194540.0AppointedBishop of Antofagasta, Chile
18 Mar 194540.2InstalledBishop of Antofagasta, Chile
29 May 195752.4ResignedBishop of Antofagasta, Chile
29 May 195752.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bareta
29 May 195752.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chile, Military
10 Dec 197065.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Bareta
4 Aug 198580.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Antofagasta, Chile

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Hernán Frías Hurtado:
Bishop Hernán Frías Hurtado (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Antofagasta

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 45.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015