Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio José Luis Castro Alvarez, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile

Titular Bishop of Lycopolis

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1867Born
24 Aug 188417.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
20 Sep 189023.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
21 Feb 191850.8AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
2 Jun 191851.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
4 Aug 191851.2InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
23 Oct 192457.4ResignedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
23 Oct 192457.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
17 Feb 192658.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
13 Aug 193568.3DiedBishop Emeritus of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile

MicroData Summary for Antonio José Luis Castro Alvarez
Bishop Antonio José Luis Castro Alvarez SS.CC. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos de Ancud

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValparaiso

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 113
  • prof/c1: CB, 9 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017