Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Sepúlveda Hermosilla

Deceased

Ecclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) Emeritus of Temuco, Chile

Titular Bishop of Sophene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1858Born
2 Apr 188122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Concepción, Chile
1908²49.7AppointedEcclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Temuco, Chile
18 Oct 191153.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sophene
17 Mar 191253.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sophene
1919²60.7ResignedEcclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Temuco, Chile
9 Jun 193476.1DiedEcclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) Emeritus of Temuco, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Sepúlveda Hermosilla
Bishop Ricardo Sepúlveda Hermosilla (born , died ) Ecclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) Emeritus of Temuco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoihueco

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 18
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 22 Nov 2019

Quantcast