Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reinaldo Muñoz Olave

Deceased

Ecclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) Emeritus of Chillán, Chile

Titular Bishop of Pogla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1864Born
17 Dec 188723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Concepción, Chile
1 Mar 191651.9AppointedEcclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Chillán, Chile
5 Aug 191652.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Pogla
8 Dec 191652.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pogla
1920²55.7ResignedEcclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Chillán, Chile
16 Oct 194278.5DiedEcclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) Emeritus of Chillán, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Reinaldo Muñoz Olave (VIAF: 89145857106422922615)
Bishop Reinaldo Muñoz Olave (born , died ) Ecclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) Emeritus of Chillán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYerbas Buenas
Ordained PriestSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 62
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 22 Nov 2019

Quantcast