Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ricardo Durand Flórez, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Callao


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1917BornAmbo
18 Dec 194831.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
14 Feb 196648.8AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
25 Mar 196648.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
14 Jan 197557.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Callao, Peru
17 Aug 199578.3RetiredBishop of Callao, Peru
19 Mar 200486.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Callao, Peru

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Durand Flórez:
Archbishop Ricardo Durand Flórez S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Callao

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013