Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julián Pedro Martínez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paraná

Titular Bishop of Ibora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1889BornVilla de San José
30 Nov 190718.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paraná, Argentina
7 Jul 192738.1AppointedBishop of Paraná, Argentina
16 Oct 192738.4Ordained BishopBishop of Paraná, Argentina
28 Jul 193445.2ResignedBishop of Paraná, Argentina
28 Jul 193445.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ibora
26 Jun 196677.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Paraná, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Julián Pedro Martínez:
Bishop Julián Pedro Martínez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paraná

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015