Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Morano

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1872BornCa´vano, Italy
10 Aug 189725.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 193563.5AppointedSecretary of the Apostolic Signatura
14 Dec 195987.5Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 195987.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
5 Apr 196289.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Fallaba
19 Apr 196289.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Fallaba
19 Apr 196289.8ResignedTitular Archbishop of Fallaba
12 Jul 196896.0DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

MicroData Summary for Francesco Morano:
Francesco Cardinal Morano (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

  • a priest for 70.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
  • a cardinal for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1962, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015