Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sante Portalupi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Christopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1909BornMortara
15 Apr 193323.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 195949.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
29 Jan 195949.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
14 Oct 196151.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Christopolis
3 Dec 196152.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Christopolis
27 Sep 196757.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Northern Africa
4 Mar 197262.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Algeria
22 Mar 197262.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Tunisia
1976¹66.1ResignedApostolic Delegate to Northern Africa
197666.1AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Libya
5 Mar 197666.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Morocco
15 Dec 197970.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
31 Mar 198474.4DiedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sante Portalupi (VIAF: 307396858)
Archbishop Sante Portalupi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Portugal

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Aug 2016