Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Federico Lunardi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Paraguay

Titular Archbishop of Side


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1880Born
30 Mar 190726.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 193655.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Side
16 Nov 193655.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
12 Dec 193656.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Side
3 Oct 193857.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
Dec 1947³66.9AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
8 Jul 194968.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
9 Nov 195473.9DiedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Federico Lunardi (VIAF: 49081423)
Archbishop Federico Lunardi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Paraguay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLivorno
Death PlaceAssunzione

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 88
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 72, and Page 147, and Page 201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast