Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Bracci

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments

Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1879BornVignanello
6 Jun 190323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
30 Dec 193556.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
15 Dec 195879.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 195879.1ResignedSecretary of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
18 Dec 195879.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
5 Apr 196282.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Idassa
19 Apr 196282.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Idassa
19 Apr 196282.4ResignedTitular Archbishop of Idassa
24 Mar 196787.3DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments

MicroData Summary for Francesco Bracci:
Francesco Cardinal Bracci (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of Discipline of the Sacraments

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
  • a cardinal for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1962, Number 33
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015