Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Jannotta

Deceased

Bishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1847Born
23 Sep 187124.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 190053.4AppointedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
23 Dec 190053.4Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
5 Dec 193386.3DiedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Jannotta
Bishop Antonio Maria Jannotta (born , died ) Bishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant'Agata dei Goti

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 115
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018