Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joaquín Anselmo María Cardinal Albareda y Ramoneda, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1892BornBarcelona, Spain
4 Nov 190816.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Jul 191523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Jun 193644.3AppointedPrefect of the Vatican Library
19 Mar 196270.1Elevated to Cardinal
22 Mar 196270.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine
5 Apr 196270.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gypsaria
19 Apr 196270.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Gypsaria
20 Apr 196270.2ResignedTitular Archbishop of Gypsaria
19 Jul 196674.4DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Anselmo María Albareda y Ramoneda:
Cardinal Joaquín Anselmo María Albareda y Ramoneda O.S.B. (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
  • a cardinal for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 42
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013