Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Eleuterio Rey

Bishop Emeritus of Zárate-Campana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1933 BornMaipú
20 Dec 195825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mendoza, Argentina
30 Apr 198350.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mendoza, Argentina
30 Apr 198350.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hilta
3 Jul 198350.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hilta
18 Dec 199158.7AppointedBishop of Zárate-Campana, Argentina
21 Mar 199258.9InstalledBishop of Zárate-Campana, Argentina
3 Feb 200672.8ResignedBishop of Zárate-Campana, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Rafael Eleuterio Rey:
Bishop Rafael Eleuterio Rey (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Zárate-Campana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zárate-Campana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Feb 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013