Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Maria Hourton Poisson

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Temuco

Titular Bishop of Materiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1926BornSaubusse, France
24 Sep 194923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
5 Feb 196942.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Puerto Montt, Chile
5 Feb 196942.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Materiana
20 Apr 196942.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Materiana
18 Feb 197447.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
11 Feb 199265.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Temuco, Chile
21 Sep 200175.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Temuco, Chile
5 Dec 201185.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Temuco, Chile

MicroData Summary for Jorge Maria Hourton Poisson:
Bishop Jorge Maria Hourton Poisson (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Temuco

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 5 Dec 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013