Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Osvaldo González Morales, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Punta Arenas, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1935 Born
31 Jan 195216.7First VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
29 Jan 195822.7Final VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Feb 196327.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
28 Mar 197438.9AppointedBishop of Punta Arenas, Chile
27 Apr 197439.0Ordained BishopBishop of Punta Arenas, Chile
4 Mar 200670.8RetiredBishop of Punta Arenas, Chile

MicroData Summary for Tomás Osvaldo González Morales (VIAF: 36449891)
Bishop Tomás Osvaldo González Morales S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Punta Arenas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained PriestTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Punta Arenas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1/prof: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017