Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sotero Sanz Villalba

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to México

Titular Archbishop of Emerita Augusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1919Born
4 Jul 194223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
16 Jul 197051.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Emerita Augusta
16 Jul 197051.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
12 Sep 197051.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Emerita Augusta
24 Nov 197758.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to México
17 Jan 197858.7DiedApostolic Delegate to México

MicroData Summary for Sotero Sanz Villalba (VIAF: 391145858125723022298)
Archbishop Sotero Sanz Villalba (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Buste, Spain
Ordained PriestComillas, Spain
Ordained BishopN.S. del Pilar, Basilica, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza, Spain

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 619
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast