Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos Mariano Pérez Eslava, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Salta, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1907Born
9 Jul 193325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 Mar 195749.3AppointedBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
19 May 195749.4Ordained BishopBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
6 Jul 195749.6InstalledBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
26 Dec 196356.0AppointedArchbishop of Salta, Argentina
11 Apr 196456.3InstalledArchbishop of Salta, Argentina
7 Jan 198476.1RetiredArchbishop of Salta, Argentina
25 Mar 198577.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Salta, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Carlos Mariano Pérez Eslava
Archbishop Carlos Mariano Pérez Eslava S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Salta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCascallares, Diocese of La Plata
Ordained BishopSagrado Corazón, Church, Bahía Blanca, Archdiocese of Bahía Blanca
Death PlaceFortín Mercedes

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1957, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022