Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Gutiérrez Pedraza, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Prelate of Cafayate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1926BornBuenavista de Valdavia, Spain
11 Mar 195124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
10 Oct 197347.0AppointedPrelate of Cafayate, Argentina
10 Oct 197347.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaguari
16 Dec 197347.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaguari
3 Nov 197751.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Gaguari
23 Nov 199064.2DiedPrelate of Cafayate, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Diego Gutiérrez Pedraza:
Bishop Diego Gutiérrez Pedraza O.S.A. (born , died ) Prelate of Cafayate

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013