Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Germán Bochatey Chaneton, O.S.A.

Auxiliary Bishop of La Plata

Titular Bishop of Mons in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1955 BornBuenos Aires
12 Sep 197520.1ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
21 Dec 198025.4Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
24 Apr 198125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
4 Dec 201257.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
4 Dec 201257.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mons in Mauretania
9 Mar 201357.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mons in Mauretania

MicroData Summary for Alberto Germán Bochatey Chaneton:
Bishop Alberto Germán Bochatey Chaneton O.S.A. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of La Plata

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of La Plata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2012
  • b: CB, 4 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,663

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013