Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Santiago Peyrou, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1913Born
17 Dec 193926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Jun 196450.6AppointedBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
16 Aug 196450.7Ordained BishopBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
19 Feb 197460.3ResignedBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
2 Mar 200591.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Santiago Peyrou
Bishop Eugenio Santiago Peyrou S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Comodoro Rivadavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018